This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 21:09:11 (UTC).

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS VS MIAH SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 INFINITI OF VAN NUYS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIAH SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2323

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

Defendant

SMITH MIAH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

10/24/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/24/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/24/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/13/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/13/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/13/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 12/13/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Infiniti Of Van Nuys against Defendant Miah Smith on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Infiniti Of Van Nuys on 10/24/2022 for the principal amount of $1,035.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $1,125.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff); As to: Miah Smith (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/03/2022; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff); As to: Miah Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITI OF VAN NUYS is a litigant