This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 01:29:54 (UTC).

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS VS LONNIE WALTON

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 INFINITI OF VAN NUYS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LONNIE WALTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2270

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

Defendant

WALTON LONNIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/24/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

10/24/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/24/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/17/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2022

12/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2022

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/1/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement) of 01/27/2023

1/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement) of 01/27/2023

Minute Order - Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement)

1/27/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Compliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement) of 01/27/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Infiniti Of Van Nuys on 10/24/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAddress for Lonnie Walton (Defendant) clerical correction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCompliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 01/27/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 12/01/2022; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCompliance Hearing re first payment of settlement agreement scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff); As to: Lonnie Walton (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff); As to: Lonnie Walton (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less