This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 09:10:45 (UTC).

HUDSON DADON, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ET AL. VS BODUM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 HUDSON DADON, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BODUM MANUFACTURING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2469

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DADON BARRY

Defendant

BODUM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hudson Dadon, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Barry Dadon (Plaintiff); As to: Bodum Manufacturing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hudson Dadon, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Barry Dadon (Plaintiff); As to: Bodum Manufacturing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hudson Dadon, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Barry Dadon (Plaintiff); As to: Bodum Manufacturing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH WIND