This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:09:56 (UTC).

HOWARD PAUL SHORE VS SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 HOWARD PAUL SHORE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0127

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHORE HOWARD PAUL

Defendants

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING LLC

ATHAS CAPITAL GROUP INC

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/9/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/9/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/9/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/9/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

1/17/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

1/24/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 1A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Howard Paul Shore (Plaintiff); As to: Athas Capital group, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department: As To Parties changed from Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant) to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Howard Paul Shore (Plaintiff); As to: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Howard Paul Shore (Plaintiff); As to: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant); Athas Capital group, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Howard Paul Shore (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant), Athas Capital group, Inc (Defendant) to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant), Athas Capital group, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant), Athas Capital group, Inc (Defendant) to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC (Defendant), Athas Capital group, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less