This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 12:45:55 (UTC).

HOWARD JORDAN VS DEPT.OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 HOWARD JORDAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3039

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORDAN HOWARD

Defendant

DEPT.OF TRANSPORTATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/17/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

8/17/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/17/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 1A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing - Attachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Howard Jordan (Plaintiff); As to: Dept.of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant