Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 05:38:22 (UTC).

HIRSCHFELD KRAEMER LLP VS FLOW HEALTH LABORATORIES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 HIRSCHFELD KRAEMER LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLOW HEALTH LABORATORIES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIRSCHFELD KRAEMER LLP

Defendants

FLOW HEALTH LABORATORIES LLC

MESHKIN ALEX AKA ALEXANDER BRADFORD MESHKIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH STEPHEN R

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

6/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP on 06/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Flow Health Laboratories LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 06/14/2021; Service Cost: 99.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Flow Health Laboratories LLC (Defendant); Alex Meshkin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Flow Health Laboratories LLC (Defendant); Alex Meshkin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Flow Health Laboratories LLC (Defendant); Alex Meshkin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSMITH STEPHEN R