This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 16:10:09 (UTC).

HERC RENTALS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 HERC RENTALS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4003

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERC RENTALS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

JAURE ANDREA

CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOPOURIAN JULIE M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

2/7/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

2/14/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

2/17/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings

12/27/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

10/14/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Support

9/20/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Support

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/26/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/16/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation against Defendant CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation and Defendant Andrea Jaure on the Complaint filed by HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation on 05/24/2021 for damages of $9,073.37, attorney fees of $4,441.00, interest of $1,959.84, and costs of $475.48 for a total of $15,949.69.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Andrea Jaure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from Andrea Jaure (Defendant), CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) to CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant), Andrea Jaure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant), Andrea Jaure (Defendant) to CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant), Andrea Jaure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Jaure (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/03/2021; Service Cost: 112.74; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/28/2021; Service Cost: 112.74; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Andrea Jaure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HERC RENTALS, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CICO ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Andrea Jaure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cico Electrical Contractors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOPOURIAN, JULIE M