This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 10:34:51 (UTC).

HAYMAN DEVELOPMENT LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS JOSE DE LA CRUZ

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 HAYMAN DEVELOPMENT LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE DE LA CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1055

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYMAN DEVELOPMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

DE LA CRUZ JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISCHBACH JOSEPH S.

CONTRERAS CHRISTIAN

Defendant Attorney

BLOOM JAY STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/8/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

3/19/2021: Answer - Answer

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

5/17/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hayman Development LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jose De La Cruz (Defendant); As to: Hayman Development LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hayman Development LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Jose De La Cruz (Defendant); Service Date: 02/21/2021; Service Cost: 102.13; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hayman Development LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Jose De La Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hayman Development LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Jose De La Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hayman Development LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Jose De La Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOOM JAY STEVEN