Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 12:44:20 (UTC).

GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY VS ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2802

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY

Defendants

ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA SERVPRO OF EAGLE ROCK SOUTH GLENDALE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TOOLIN AN INDIVIDUAL PHILLIP

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALL IN ONE RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA SERVPRO OF EAGLE ROCK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GABLEDON AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA SERVPRO OF EAGLE ROCK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOW RON

Defendant Attorney

PLUMTREE A. MARIA

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

5/12/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

5/12/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

5/26/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

5/26/2021: Answer - Answer

Complaint - Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • Hearing04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: GABLEDON AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/10/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ALL IN ONE RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 04/09/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/14/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 04/12/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); ALL IN ONE RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); GABLEDON AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); As to: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); ALL IN ONE RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); GABLEDON AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); ALL IN ONE RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); GABLEDON AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GROUNDCARE LANDSCAPE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ER RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); ALL IN ONE RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); GABLEDON AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW RON