This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 06:28:42 (UTC).

GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION VS CAMERON QUINN

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 GRANT WEBER, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAMERON QUINN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0215

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT & WEBER A CORPORATION

Defendants

QUINN AKA CAMERON S

QUINN CAMERON AKA CAMERON S QUINN AKA CAMERON S QUINN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILNER ALAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/3/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Summons/Complaint

3/3/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Summons/Complaint

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement - Conditional

3/3/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement - Conditional

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOT FOUND OR NON SERVICE RETURN

3/5/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOT FOUND OR NON SERVICE RETURN

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2026
  • Hearing02/19/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice NOT FOUND OR NON SERVICE RETURN; Filed by: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Summons/Complaint; Filed by: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional; Filed by: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: 02/19/2026; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/19/2026 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement - Conditional: Filed By: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 03/03/2021; As To Parties: CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from CAMERON QUINN (Defendant) to aka CAMERON S QUINN (Defendant), CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from CAMERON QUINN (Defendant) to CAMERON QUINN (Defendant), aka CAMERON S QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from CAMERON QUINN (Defendant) to CAMERON QUINN (Defendant), aka CAMERON S QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GRANT & WEBER, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CAMERON QUINN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANT & WEBER INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILNER ESQ. ALAN D.