This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 13:36:32 (UTC).

GRANT ROBERTSON VS WALMART INC. A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 GRANT ROBERTSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3415

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON GRANT

Defendant

WALMART INC. A FOREIGN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COLBERT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

8/27/2021: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

8/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Amended Complaint - (Amended)

8/11/2021: Amended Complaint - (Amended)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

7/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

7/30/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Reply (name extension) - Reply Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

7/22/2021: Reply (name extension) - Reply Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to the demurrer by defendant

7/16/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to the demurrer by defendant

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/6/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/6/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Michael F. Colbert in support of Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

7/6/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Michael F. Colbert in support of Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/6/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

7/6/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/6/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Complaint - Complaint

4/30/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2024
  • Hearing05/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAmended Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Grant Robertson (Plaintiff); As to: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/29/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketReply Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketOpposition to the demurrer by defendant; Filed by: Grant Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Grant Robertson (Plaintiff); As to: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/10/21; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Grant Robertson (Plaintiff); As to: Walmart Inc. a foreign corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Grant Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLBERT MICHAEL