This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 06:50:37 (UTC).

GGF CARSON, LLC, ET AL. VS SMC GREASE SPECIALIST, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 GGF CARSON, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMC GREASE SPECIALIST, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0309

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GGF CARSON LLC

GASKA INC

Defendant

SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/01/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment

7/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/01/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/2/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/3/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/3/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/11/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

4/29/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/29/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/29/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/29/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/29/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff GGF Carson, LLC and Plaintiff Gaska, Inc against Defendant SMC Grease Specialist, Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by GGF Carson, LLC, et al. on 04/29/2021 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $5,115.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/01/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 06/03/2021; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Gaska, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: SMC Grease Specialist, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: GGF Carson, LLC (Plaintiff); Gaska, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: SMC Grease Specialist, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Gaska, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: GGF Carson, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GASKA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant