This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 08:11:21 (UTC).

GERARDO AGUILAR VS NORTHGATE GONZALEZ LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 GERARDO AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NORTHGATE GONZALEZ LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6434

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR GERARDO

Defendant

NORTHGATE GONZALEZ LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

ZUREK RONALD

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/30/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/30/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/30/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/30/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/30/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

11/3/2022: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

11/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2025
  • Hearing10/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Gerardo Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gerardo Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Gerardo Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gerardo Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gerardo Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Northgate Gonzalez LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Gerardo Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less