This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 01:20:05 (UTC).

GENOVEVA DELGADO, ET AL. VS MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 GENOVEVA DELGADO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1319

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELGADO GENOVEVA

MARTINEZ BENITA

Defendants

VALENTINO AVILA MICHAEL JACK

PADILLA CORINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABDOLHOSSEINI TINA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SCHMECKPEPER KATHY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/16/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

9/16/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant); As to: GENOVEVA DELGADO (Plaintiff); BENITA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GENOVEVA DELGADO (Plaintiff); BENITA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant); CORINA PADILLA (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GENOVEVA DELGADO (Plaintiff); BENITA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant); CORINA PADILLA (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GENOVEVA DELGADO (Plaintiff); BENITA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant); CORINA PADILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GENOVEVA DELGADO (Plaintiff); BENITA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant); CORINA PADILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GENOVEVA DELGADO (Plaintiff); BENITA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JACK VALENTINO AVILA (Defendant); CORINA PADILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHMECKPEPER KATHY ANNE