This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 08:53:09 (UTC).

GCFS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MARIO MATADAMAS, SR.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 GCFS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIO MATADAMAS, SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9519

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

MATADAMAS MARIO SR. AKA MARIO MATADAMAS DBA AUTOMOBILE WASH AND DETAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON BRENT D

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

11/10/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/10/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

12/20/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/20/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO MATADAMAS, Sr. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/23/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO MATADAMAS, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO MATADAMAS, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO MATADAMAS, Sr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON BRENT D