This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 16:06:39 (UTC).

GCFS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JEREMY ALBO, INDIVIDUALLY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 GCFS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEREMY ALBO, INDIVIDUALLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5220

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ALBO JEREMY INDIVIDUALLY DBA BOBA ALBO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON BRENT D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

2/27/2023: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/27/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/27/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/27/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/10/2023: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/10/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2025
  • Hearing06/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: JEREMY ALBO, individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY ALBO, individually (Defendant); Service Date: 03/08/2023; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY ALBO, individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY ALBO, individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY ALBO, individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GCFS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JEREMY ALBO, individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less