Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 09:31:11 (UTC).

GARY GREENE VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 GARY GREENE filed an Other lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1142

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREENE GARY

Respondent

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRISCOE J. JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Petition (name extension) - Petition Notice And Petition For An Order To Preserve Evidence

4/22/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition Notice And Petition For An Order To Preserve Evidence

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/15/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition PETITION TO OPEN A SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESERVING HEARING DATE FOR PETITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OR PRESERVE EVIDENCE

4/15/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition PETITION TO OPEN A SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESERVING HEARING DATE FOR PETITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OR PRESERVE EVIDENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

4/15/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • Hearing08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GARY GREENE (Petitioner); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION (Respondent); Service Date: 04/23/2021; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPetition Notice And Petition For An Order To Preserve Evidence; Filed by: GARY GREENE (Petitioner); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GARY GREENE (Petitioner); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION (Respondent); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition PETITION TO OPEN A SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESERVING HEARING DATE FOR PETITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OR PRESERVE EVIDENCE scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GARY GREENE (Petitioner); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPetition PETITION TO OPEN A SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESERVING HEARING DATE FOR PETITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY OR PRESERVE EVIDENCE; Filed by: GARY GREENE (Petitioner); As to: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISCOE J. JACKSON