This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 16:15:48 (UTC).

GARDEN WEST ESTATES VS RICHARD ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 GARDEN WEST ESTATES filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARD ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1693

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARDEN WEST ESTATES

Respondent

ALVAREZ RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

TREVILLYAN JONATHAN TYLER ESQ.

TREVILLYAN JONATHAN T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

5/26/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition (name extension) - Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED

5/26/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/3/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF EVELYN OVANDO IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILEHOME ABANDONED

8/3/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF EVELYN OVANDO IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILEHOME ABANDONED

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/29/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Declare Mobile Home Abandoned, Filed b...)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Declare Mobile Home Abandoned, Filed b...)

Judgment - Judgment

10/4/2021: Judgment - Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment for Abandonment: Status Date changed from 10/04/2021 to 10/04/2021; Name Extension: for Abandonment; Result Date changed from 10/04/2021 to 10/04/2021; As To Parties changed from Richard Alvarez (Respondent) to Richard Alvarez (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Garden West Estates (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED: Filed By: Garden West Estates (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sale / Disposal of Mobilehome and Submission of Accounting Pursuant to Civil Code Section 798.61 scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order SYSTEM ERROR: Status Date changed from 09/29/2021 to 09/29/2021; Result: Stricken; Result Date: 09/29/2021; Name Extension changed from (Hearing on Petition to Declare Mobile Home Abandoned, Filed b...) to SYSTEM ERROR; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Entered to Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Garden West Estates (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Declare Mobile Home Abandoned, Filed b...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Declare Mobile Home Abandoned, Filed b...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Declare Mobile Home Abandoned, Filed by Petitioner Garden West Estates scheduled for 09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/29/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Garden West Estates (Petitioner); As to: Richard Alvarez (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Richard Alvarez; On the Petition filed by Garden West Estates on 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by Garden West Estates on 05/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Garden West Estates, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED scheduled for 09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Garden West Estates (Petitioner); As to: Richard Alvarez (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPetition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED; Filed by: Garden West Estates (Petitioner); As to: Richard Alvarez (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDEN WEST ESTATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN