This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2023 at 02:49:58 (UTC).

GALPIN MOTORS, INC VS OSCAR MEDINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 GALPIN MOTORS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OSCAR MEDINA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN A. R. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0196

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN A. R. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALPIN MOTORS INC

Defendants

MEDINA OSCAR

MONTANO DE GALDAMEZ ANA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/16/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/16/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/16/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2023, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2023, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/7/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/7/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2023, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 04/07/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff GALPIN MOTORS, INC against Defendant OSCAR MEDINA and Defendant ANA MONTANO DE GALDAMEZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by GALPIN MOTORS, INC on 02/16/2023 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $230.00 for a total of $2,730.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Nora McNeela; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: ANA MONTANO DE GALDAMEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/03/2023; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR MEDINA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/01/2023; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR MEDINA (Defendant); ANA MONTANO DE GALDAMEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lauren A. R. Lofton in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less