This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2023 at 02:49:41 (UTC).

GALPIN MOTORS, INC VS JUAN ROBLES NIEVES

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 GALPIN MOTORS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN ROBLES NIEVES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN A. R. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0195

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN A. R. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALPIN MOTORS INC

Defendant

ROBLES NIEVES JUAN AKA JUAN LUIS ROBLES NIEVES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/16/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/16/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/16/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/3/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/15/2023: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/7/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2023

4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Nora McNeela; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 04/07/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by GALPIN MOTORS, INC on 02/16/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Rejected; Submitted by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN ROBLES NIEVES (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN ROBLES NIEVES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lauren A. R. Lofton in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less