This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2022 at 09:01:16 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC VS WARREN SLATER

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WARREN SLATER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6803

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC

Defendant

SLATER WARREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARKOON ANNA C

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment

10/5/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/5/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of entry of judgment

10/6/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of entry of judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

9/6/2022: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/1/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

7/27/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Witness List - Witness List

7/27/2022: Witness List - Witness List

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

7/27/2022: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/27/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

7/27/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

7/28/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

9/10/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

9/10/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of entry of judgment; Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Warren Slater (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC against Defendant Warren Slater on the Complaint filed by Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC on 07/26/2021 for damages of $14,066.89 and costs of $489.10 for a total of $14,555.99.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 10/05/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Warren Slater (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Warren Slater (Defendant); Service Date: 07/31/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Warren Slater (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Warren Slater (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Warren Slater (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARKOON ANNA C