This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2023 at 03:04:50 (UTC).

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION VS CHASE PARTNERS LTD., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHASE PARTNERS LTD , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5110

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC. A CORPORATION

Defendant

CHASE PARTNERS LTD. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELHOUSE CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

12/5/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

2/10/2023: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chase Partners Ltd., A Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chase Partners Ltd., A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chase Partners Ltd., A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chase Partners Ltd., A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chase Partners Ltd., A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Chase Partners Ltd., A Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less