Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 12:29:00 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS CITY OF TORRANCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0381

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendants

CLARKE CONTRACTING CORPORATION

CITY OF TORRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/10/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/14/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Frontier California Inc. on 01/14/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Frontier California Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAddress for Julia Dragojevic (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/20/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Clarke Contracting Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/20/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); Clarke Contracting Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); Clarke Contracting Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); Clarke Contracting Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLARKE CONTRACTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAGOJEVIC, JULIA