This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2022 at 20:38:40 (UTC).

FRED LOYA INSURANCE COMPANY VS ALBERTO SANTOYO

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 FRED LOYA INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERTO SANTOYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2823

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRED LOYA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SANTOYO ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ MARC A

Defendant Attorney

SULLIVAN PAUL F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

4/22/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

4/22/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/22/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

4/22/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/9/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

9/9/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

9/7/2022: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Answer - Answer

9/7/2022: Answer - Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/22/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/25/2022

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/25/2022

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

10/25/2022: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/25/2022

10/25/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/25/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STLC02823, 21STLC08543 are related; case number 21STLC08543 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/25/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Mark E. Windham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case (with case 21STLC08543 Department 26): Filed By: Alberto Santoyo (Defendant); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required; Name Extension: (with case 21STLC08543 Department 26); Result Date: 09/09/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fred Loya Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alberto Santoyo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fred Loya Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alberto Santoyo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fred Loya Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alberto Santoyo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN PAUL F.