This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 13:24:42 (UTC).

FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC VS MICHAEL JAMES BOYD

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL JAMES BOYD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0508

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORMAN FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

BOYD MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/20/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/20/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/20/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/14/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/14/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/14/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Jose Fuentes, Manager)

7/14/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Jose Fuentes, Manager)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/14/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 07/14/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Jose Fuentes, Manager); Filed by: FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC against Defendant MICHAEL JAMES BOYD on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC on 05/20/2022 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $159.00 for a total of $2,659.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JAMES BOYD (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/31/2022; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: FORMAN FINANCIAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JAMES BOYD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant