This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 04:30:16 (UTC).

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN VS DIBSY CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIBSY CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6216

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN

Defendant

DIBSY CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA DIBSY CORPORATION DBA SUBWAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/14/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: DIBSY CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/27/2022; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: DIBSY CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: DIBSY CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: DIBSY CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V