This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 08:02:33 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC. VS TRACY R. MCELROY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRACY R MCELROY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0328

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.

Defendants

MCELROY TRACY R.

CUNNIGHAM ASHLEY Y.

CUNNINGHAM ASHLEY Y.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

3/16/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

3/16/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/16/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

4/11/2022: Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service TRACY R MCELROY SASE

3/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service TRACY R MCELROY SASE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service ASHLEY CUNNINGHAM SASE

3/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service ASHLEY CUNNINGHAM SASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. on 03/16/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR); Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Tracy R. McElroy (Defendant); Ashley Y. Cunningham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service TRACY R MCELROY SASE: Name Extension changed from TRACY R MCELROY to TRACY R MCELROY SASE; As To Parties changed from Tracy R. McElroy (Defendant) to Tracy R. McElroy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service ASHLEY CUNNINGHAM SASE: Name Extension changed from ASHLEY CUNNINGHAM to ASHLEY CUNNINGHAM SASE; As To Parties changed from Ashley Y. Cunningham (Defendant) to Ashley Y. Cunningham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service ASHLEY CUNNINGHAM; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ashley Y. Cunningham (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 3/24/2022; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service TRACY R MCELROY; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Tracy R. McElroy (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 3/24/2022; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Ashley Y. Cunningham (Defendant): Last Name changed from Cunnigham to Cunningham

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Tracy R. McElroy (Defendant); Ashley Y. Cunnigham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant