This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2022 at 08:25:44 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC VS RICARDO MIGUEL CARRETO QUIQUIBIX

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICARDO MIGUEL CARRETO QUIQUIBIX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNETTE GRIDIRON WINSTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0262

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNETTE GRIDIRON WINSTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

CARRETO QUIQUIBIX RICARDO MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/22/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/22/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/22/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/17/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose Fuentes

4/14/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose Fuentes

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/14/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/14/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets, Notice of Entry of Judgment

4/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/14/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets, Notice of Entry of Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/14/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/14/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets, Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 04/14/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Foreman Financial Inc against Defendant Ricardo Miguel Carreto Quiquibix on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Foreman Financial Inc on 02/22/2022 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $119.00 for a total of $1,619.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose Fuentes; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Miguel Carreto Quiquibix (Defendant); Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/14/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Ricardo Miguel Carreto Quiquibix (Defendant) to Ricardo Miguel Carreto Quiquibix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Miguel Carreto Quiquibix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lynette Gridiron Winston in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant