This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 08:03:35 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC. VS NANCY CORINA RUIZ

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 FOREMAN FINANCIAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NANCY CORINA RUIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0572

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.

Defendant

RUIZ NANCY CORINA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/16/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/16/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/16/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service Nancy Corina Ruiz

6/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service Nancy Corina Ruiz

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/1/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2022

7/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2022

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/1/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 07/01/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. on 05/16/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service Nancy Corina Ruiz; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Nancy Corina Ruiz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/31/2022; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Foreman Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Nancy Corina Ruiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant