This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 02:53:38 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC VS MARIA DE JESUS CABALLERO

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIA DE JESUS CABALLERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNETTE GRIDIRON WINSTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0092

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNETTE GRIDIRON WINSTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

CABALLERO MARIA DE JESUS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/18/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/18/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/18/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/3/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/11/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/11/2022

3/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/11/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/11/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/11/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 03/11/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Foreman Financial Inc against Defendant Maria De Jesus Caballero on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Foreman Financial Inc on 01/18/2022 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $119.00 for a total of $2,619.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Jesus Caballero (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/27/22; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Maria De Jesus Caballero (Defendant) to Maria De Jesus Caballero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Jesus Caballero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lynette Gridiron Winston in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant