This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 03:14:26 (UTC).

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC VS DANIEL LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNETTE GRIDIRON WINSTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0705

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNETTE GRIDIRON WINSTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC

Defendants

LOPEZ DANIEL

ACEROS SONYA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/6/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

6/6/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

7/15/2022: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/15/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 1427 West Covina Parkway, West Covina, CA 91790; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/30/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Lopez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/18/22; Service Cost: 94.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Sonya Marie Aceros (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/18/22; Service Cost: 94.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Sonya Marie Aceros (Defendant), Daniel Lopez (Defendant) to Sonya Marie Aceros (Defendant), Daniel Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Foreman Financial Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Lopez (Defendant); Sonya Marie Aceros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lynette Gridiron Winston in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant