Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 08:47:17 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS GEVORK IGNATOSIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEVORK IGNATOSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4129

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

VARDANIAN PIRUZA

IGNATOSIAN GEVORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL TODD A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Piruza Vardanian (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/19/2021; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gevork Ignatosian (Defendant); Piruza Vardanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gevork Ignatosian (Defendant); Piruza Vardanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gevork Ignatosian (Defendant); Piruza Vardanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A. MACDOWELL