This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 04:19:14 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS ANTONIO FALCO

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTONIO FALCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1459

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

FALCO ANTONIO DBA DE SOTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

1/26/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Falco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Falco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Falco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard