This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 04:09:36 (UTC).

FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NORNITHA HELENE SPENCER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORNITHA HELENE SPENCER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8653

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

SPENCER NORNITHA HELENE AKA NORNITHA H. SPENCER AKA NORNITHA SPENCER AN INDIVIDUAL

CONDE INDIVIDUALLY AND EDGAR DBA THE CAR GUY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICHAEL DONALD

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery) - Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)

12/16/2021: Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery) - Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/16/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery) - Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)

12/16/2021: Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery) - Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

12/16/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

12/16/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

12/16/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery) - Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)

12/16/2021: Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery) - Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/2/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2024
  • Hearing12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) scheduled for 02/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company on 12/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company as to Edgar Conde, individually and and California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Michael Donald VanLochem (Attorney): Organization Name: Vanlochem & Associates, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAddress for Michael Donald VanLochem (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Nornitha Helene Spencer (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/22/2021; Service Cost: 69.46; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Conde, individually and (Defendant); Service Date: 12/20/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) scheduled for 02/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant); Service Date: 12/09/2021; Service Cost: 133.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Nornitha Helene Spencer (Defendant); Edgar Conde, individually and (Defendant); California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Nornitha Helene Spencer (Defendant); Edgar Conde, individually and (Defendant); California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Nornitha Helene Spencer (Defendant); Edgar Conde, individually and (Defendant); California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONDE INDIVIDUALLY AND EDGAR DBA THE CAR GUY is a litigant

Latest cases where FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D