This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 11:55:38 (UTC).

FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS WALTON & WALTON LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WALTON WALTON LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3918

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIRST LEGAL NETWORK LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AMERICAN LEGAL INVESTIGATION SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA FIRST LEGAL INVESTIGATIONS

Defendant

WALTON & WALTON LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARTIN GREGG A. ESQ.

LEE ANN S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/19/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/19/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAN LEGAL INVESTIGATION SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WALTON & WALTON LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/25/2021; Service Cost: 118.61; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to WALTON & WALTON LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership; On the Complaint filed by FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, et al. on 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAN LEGAL INVESTIGATION SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WALTON & WALTON LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAN LEGAL INVESTIGATION SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WALTON & WALTON LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAN LEGAL INVESTIGATION SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WALTON & WALTON LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAN LEGAL INVESTIGATION SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WALTON & WALTON LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALTON & WALTON DBA MIKEL'S INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST LEGAL NETWORK LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE ANN S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN GREGG ADAM