This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 23:16:17 (UTC).

FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS LOW, BALL & LYNCH, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 FIRST LEGAL NETWORK, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOW, BALL LYNCH, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3225

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIRST LEGAL DEPOSITION SERVICES LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FIRST LEGAL NETWORK LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

LOW BALL & LYNCH A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN GREGG A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/23/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/23/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by First Legal Network, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company, et al. on 04/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by First Legal Network, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company and First Legal Deposition Services, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: First Legal Network, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); First Legal Deposition Services, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Low, Ball & Lynch, A California Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: First Legal Network, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); First Legal Deposition Services, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Low, Ball & Lynch, A California Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: First Legal Network, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); First Legal Deposition Services, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Low, Ball & Lynch, A California Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST LEGAL DEPOSITION SERVICES LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST LEGAL NETWORK LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN GREGG ADAM