This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 23:28:43 (UTC).

FIRST CREDIT FINANCE VS NOHO AUTO SALES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 FIRST CREDIT FINANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NOHO AUTO SALES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7028

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST CREDIT FINANCE

Defendants

NOHO AUTO SALES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LEFEVRE MICHAEL AKA MICHAEL ALVAREZ LEFEVRE

THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELDER WILLIAM NORMAN JR.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/27/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/27/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FIRST CREDIT FINANCE (Plaintiff); As to: THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 10/05/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FIRST CREDIT FINANCE (Plaintiff); As to: NOHO AUTO SALES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); MICHAEL LEFEVRE (Defendant); THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FIRST CREDIT FINANCE (Plaintiff); As to: NOHO AUTO SALES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); MICHAEL LEFEVRE (Defendant); THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FIRST CREDIT FINANCE (Plaintiff); As to: NOHO AUTO SALES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); MICHAEL LEFEVRE (Defendant); THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOHO AUTO SALES is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST CREDIT FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELDER WILLIAM NORMAN