This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 10:04:21 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, VS WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7827

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION

BEST BUY CO. INC.

APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS INC.

Not Classified By Court

BEST BUY STORES L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN

FERBER BRIAN J

CLASSEN ROGER DEREK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/1/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/1/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/1/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/1/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/1/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

12/14/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

12/14/2021: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons Cross Summons

12/14/2021: Summons - Summons Cross Summons

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

1/31/2022: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

1/31/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/17/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2024
  • Hearing11/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant); As to: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff); Best Buy Stores , L.P. (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BEST BUY CO., INC. (Defendant); As to: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: BEST BUY CO., INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff); As to: BEST BUY CO., INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/22/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant); As to: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant); As to: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff); Roes 1 to 50, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSummons Cross Summons; Issued and Filed by: APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant); As to: BRIAN J FERBER (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff); As to: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION (Defendant); BEST BUY CO., INC. (Defendant); APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff); As to: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION (Defendant); BEST BUY CO., INC. (Defendant); APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff); As to: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION (Defendant); BEST BUY CO., INC. (Defendant); APPLIANCE REPAIR SPECIALISTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Appliance Repair Specialist is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST BUY STORES L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Best Buy Co. Inc is a litigant