Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 13:54:59 (UTC).

FERNANDO GUERRERO VS ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIF. CORP.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 FERNANDO GUERRERO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIF CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0411

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRERO FERNANDO

Defendant

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIF. CORP.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/19/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/20/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/20/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/24/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/1/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F44 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff); Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/24/2021; As To Parties changed from Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant), Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff) to Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant), Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff); Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Filed By: Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/24/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff); As to: Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff); As to: Alliance United Insurance Company, a Calif. Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) MEET AND CONFER ? SMALL CLAIMS; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Fernando Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant