This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 17:12:17 (UTC).

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS CONTAINER COMPONENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONTAINER COMPONENTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2027

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

CONTAINER COMPONENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSS BARBARA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/5/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/5/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/5/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/2/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

12/2/2022: Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/2/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/2/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Default Judgment

12/13/2022: Judgment - Default Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

12/15/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

12/16/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation against Defendant Container Components, Inc., a California corporation on the Complaint filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation on 10/05/2022 for damages of $9,744.00, interest of $515.31, and costs of $623.83 for a total of $10,883.14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation on 10/05/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation, does 1-5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Container Components, Inc., a California corporation; On the Complaint filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation on 10/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/12/2022; Service Cost: 375.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Container Components, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less