This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 09:30:14 (UTC).

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC.,

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0117

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALCANTAR ROSEMARY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINETT TIMOTHY D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

4/27/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

4/27/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2024
  • Hearing01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., (Defendant); As to: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., (Defendant); As to: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., (Defendant); Service Date: 03/08/2021; Service Cost: 49.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINETT, TIMOTHY D.