This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 07:41:34 (UTC).

ESMERALDA SALAZAR VS MICHAEL DAVID SOTELO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 ESMERALDA SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL DAVID SOTELO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0123

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR ESMERALDA

Defendants

SOTELO MICHAEL DAVID

SOTELO MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KECK TIMOTHY J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/6/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/6/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/6/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/6/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2025
  • Hearing01/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Esmeralda Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Michael David Sotelo (Defendant); Michael Sotelo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Esmeralda Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Michael David Sotelo (Defendant); Michael Sotelo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Esmeralda Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Michael David Sotelo (Defendant); Michael Sotelo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keck, Timothy J