This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 03:18:40 (UTC).

EPHRAIM ISRAEL VS AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 EPHRAIM ISRAEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISRAEL EPHRAIM

Defendant

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/12/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/12/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1/13/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/23/2023: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

1/23/2023: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/26/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: EPHRAIM ISRAEL (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: EPHRAIM ISRAEL (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: EPHRAIM ISRAEL (Plaintiff); As to: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less