This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 22:06:15 (UTC).

ENTRA DEFAULT SOLUTIONS, LLC VS IN RE 2213 ROBINSON STREET, UNIT B, REDONDO BEACH, CA 90278

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 ENTRA DEFAULT SOLUTIONS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against IN RE 2213 ROBINSON STREET, UNIT B, REDONDO BEACH, CA 90278. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1923

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ENTRA DEFAULT SOLUTIONS LLC

Respondent

IN RE 2213 ROBINSON STREET UNIT B REDONDO BEACH CA 90278

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

IDLEMAN WILLIAM JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Order to Deposit (name extension) - Order to Deposit proposed order to deposit funds

6/18/2021: Order to Deposit (name extension) - Order to Deposit proposed order to deposit funds

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/16/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/16/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

6/16/2021: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

6/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

Order to Deposit (name extension) - Order to Deposit Surplus Funds

10/20/2021: Order to Deposit (name extension) - Order to Deposit Surplus Funds

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/20/2021

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/20/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Surplus Funds: Filed By: Entra Default Solutions, LLC (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketHearing - Other to Determine the Distribution of Surplus Funds Deposited with the Court scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/20/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/20/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Entra Default Solutions, LLC (Petitioner); As to: In re 2213 ROBINSON STREET, UNIT B, REDONDO BEACH, CA 90278 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit proposed order to deposit funds; Filed by: Entra Default Solutions, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Entra Default Solutions, LLC (Petitioner); As to: In re 2213 ROBINSON STREET, UNIT B, REDONDO BEACH, CA 90278 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: Entra Default Solutions, LLC (Petitioner); As to: In re 2213 ROBINSON STREET, UNIT B, REDONDO BEACH, CA 90278 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN RE: 6227 PALM AVENUE BELL CALIFORNIA 90201 is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTRA DEFAULT SOLUTIONS LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IDLEMAN, WILLIAM J