Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 06:17:58 (UTC).

ENCORE TEXTILES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS NEW PRIDE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 ENCORE TEXTILES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW PRIDE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1502

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENCORE TEXTILES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

NEW PRIDE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRINCE DAVID LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/22/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ENCORE TEXTILES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW PRIDE CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ENCORE TEXTILES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW PRIDE CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ENCORE TEXTILES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW PRIDE CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Pride Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS