This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 01:53:22 (UTC).

EMILY RUYBAL, ET AL. VS MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGMENT CO INC

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 EMILY RUYBAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MILLER DESATNIK MANAGMENT CO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0493

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUYBAL EMILY

BIGLER BENJAMIN

Defendant

MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGMENT CO INC

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Kana Devata/Property Manager

7/15/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Kana Devata/Property Manager

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/15/2021

7/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/15/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/2/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/2/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Emily Ruybal, et al. on 04/02/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Kana Devata/Property Manager; Filed by: Miller & Desatnik Managment Co Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer- Small Claims: As To Parties changed from Benjamin Bigler (Plaintiff), Emily Ruybal (Plaintiff) to Benjamin Bigler (Plaintiff), Emily Ruybal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Emily Ruybal (Plaintiff); Benjamin Bigler (Plaintiff); As to: Miller & Desatnik Managment Co Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer- Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Emily Ruybal (Plaintiff); Benjamin Bigler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO. INC. is a litigant