This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 11:02:03 (UTC).

ELMISHA BRADFORD VS ROBERT DAVIS

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 ELMISHA BRADFORD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT DAVIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0894

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADFORD ELMISHA

Defendant

DAVIS ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMKINS GARY STUART

Defendant Attorney

ELKERTON BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/10/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/10/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

2/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/10/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

4/8/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

4/8/2022: Answer - Answer

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

8/15/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

9/22/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/3/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/9/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

1/13/2023: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2025
  • Hearing02/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAddress for Steven J. Settles (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Robert Davis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Robert Davis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steven J. Settles (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAddress for Steven J. Settles (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Robert Davis (Defendant); As to: Elmisha Bradford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Robert Sidney Miller (Attorney): First Name changed from Markus to Robert; Last Name changed from Aloyan to Miller; Organization Name: BRETOI, LUTZ & STELE; Middle Name changed from M. to Sidney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for Robert Sidney Miller (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elmisha Bradford (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Davis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elmisha Bradford (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Davis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elmisha Bradford (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Davis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less