This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 05:58:14 (UTC).

ELISABETH SPOURDALAKIS VS GARMENT RESTORATION COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 ELISABETH SPOURDALAKIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GARMENT RESTORATION COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1292

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

SPOURDALAKIS ELISABETH

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

GARMENT RESTORATION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

KING DAVID P.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

THEIS BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

6/16/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/3/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

5/19/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

5/19/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/17/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/16/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elisabeth Spourdalakis on 02/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Elisabeth Spourdalakis as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Cross-Defendant); As to: Garment Restoration Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for Bryan Theis (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant); As to: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant); As to: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Plaintiff); As to: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/2021; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Plaintiff); As to: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Plaintiff); As to: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elisabeth Spourdalakis (Plaintiff); As to: Garment Restoration Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GARMENT RESTORATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THEIS BRYAN KENTON