This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 00:31:25 (UTC).

ELISABETH CARBONE VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 ELISABETH CARBONE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1013

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARBONE ELISABETH

Defendant

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/12/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/12/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/12/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/16/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Elisabeth Carbone (Plaintiff); As to: Marriott International Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elisabeth Carbone (Plaintiff); As to: Marriott International Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant