This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 23:22:25 (UTC).

EDWARD'S SHEET METAL SUPPLY, INC. VS MATTHEW CONNOLLY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 EDWARD'S SHEET METAL SUPPLY, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATTHEW CONNOLLY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6702

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD'S SHEET METAL SUPPLY INC.

Defendants

CONNOLLY MATTHEW DBA ELEMENT AIRE

ASLANIAN ARTHUR RAFFY

LJ PROPERTIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NOHO URBAN WEST IS AN ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILANIANS ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/13/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Answer - Answer

11/22/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

11/22/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/12/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/12/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

12/2/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/15/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/2/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. on 10/13/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Arthur Raffy Aslanian (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2021; Service Cost: 58.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Matthew Connolly (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: LJ Properties Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2021; Service Cost: 58.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: NOHO Urban West, is an entity form unknown (Defendant); Service Date: 10/27/2021; Service Cost: 39.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew Connolly (Defendant); Mailing Date: 10/27/2021; Service Cost: 108.90; Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew Connolly (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2021; Service Cost: 108.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew Connolly (Defendant); Arthur Raffy Aslanian (Defendant); LJ Properties Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew Connolly (Defendant); Arthur Raffy Aslanian (Defendant); LJ Properties Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edward's Sheet Metal Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew Connolly (Defendant); Arthur Raffy Aslanian (Defendant); LJ Properties Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDWARD'S SHEET METAL SUPPLY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LJ PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILANIANS ALEXANDER